VA SB319 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527)
Summary
Commonwealth Technology Research Fund; sensor sciences. Adds sensor sciences to the list of fields eligible to receive awards from the Commonwealth Technology Research Fund. This bill is identical to
Title
Technology Research Fund; adds sensor sciences to eligible research programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527) | |
2008-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 527 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB319ER) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-27 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-25 | House: Reported from Science and Technology (18-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Science and Technology | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080093340 |
Same As/Similar To
HB234 (Same As) 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0063)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB319 |