VA SB325 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0283)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0283)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Asset forfeitures. Consolidates certain forfeiture provisions found in two chapters in Title 19.2 and found in Title 4.1 and eliminates redundancies. The bill also provides that, unless otherwise provided by law, forfeitures are to be governed by Chapter 22.1 (§ 19.2-386.1 et seq.) of Title 19.2.
Title
Asset forfeitures; consolidates certain provisions and eliminates redundancies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0283) | |
2012-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 283 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-28 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB325ER) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-02-15 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-15 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-15 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB325S1 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105303D-S1 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105303D-S1 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103635D |
Same As/Similar To
HB348 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 270 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 369 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.26 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.31 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.32 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.33 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.34 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 142 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 821 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 521.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 523.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 524 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 549 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 4212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5139 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 336 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 345 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 347 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1087 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 867 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2274 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1085 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |