VA SB325 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; transportation of alcoholic beverages. Increases from one gallon to three gallons the amount of alcoholic beverages that a person may transport into the Commonwealth and consolidates current law regarding the transportation of alcoholic beverages into or within the Commonwealth. The bill contains technical amendments. Alcoholic beverage control; transportation of alcoholic beverages. Increases from one gallon to three gallons the amount of alcoholic beverages that a person may transport into the Commonwealth and consolidates current law regarding the transportation of alcoholic beverages into or within the Commonwealth. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; transportation of alcoholic beverages purchased.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201) | |
2022-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 201 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB325ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (92-Y 4-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed House with amendment (92-Y 4-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-08 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB325S1 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22104821D-S1 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22104821D-S1 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: ABC |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101959D |