VA SB326 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-23 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (14-Y 24-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-23 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (14-Y 24-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Fraud Against Taxpayers Act and the Fraud and Abuse Whistle Blower Protection Act; inclusion of deputy sheriffs; discriminatory and retaliatory action prohibited; remedies. Clarifies that deputy sheriffs employed by city or county sheriff's offices are included under the term "employees" under the Virginia Fraud Against Taxpayers Act and the Fraud and Abuse Whistle Blower Protection Act. The bill also provides that a whistle blower may bring a civil action for violation of discriminatory and retaliatory action provisions of the Fraud and Abuse Whistle Blower Protection Act. If the court finds that a violation was willfully and knowingly made, it shall impose on the officer, employee, or member in his individual capacity a civil penalty of not less than $500 nor more than $2,500. The bill also establishes a three-year statute of limitations and authorizes the court to order other appropriate remedies.
Title
Virginia Fraud Against Taxpayers & Fraud and Abuse Whistle Blower Protection Acts; remedies, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (14-Y 24-N) (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (14-Y 24-N) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14103428D-E |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB326E |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (10-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103428D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 216.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |