VA SB337 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0455)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0455)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; certain licensees to provide information to consumer while on the premises of licensed retailers. Allows any winery, farm winery, wine importer, or wine wholesaler licensee to provide to adult customers of licensed retail establishments information about wine being consumed on such premises.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; winery, farm winery, etc., licensee to provide information to consumer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0455) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 455 (effective 3/31/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB337ER) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2014-03-04 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2014-02-28 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB337S1 |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14103791D-S1 |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Incorporates SB300 |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Incorporates SB224 |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14103791D-S1 |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103299D |
Same As/Similar To
SB224 (Similar To) 2014-01-10 - Incorporated by Rehabilitation and Social Services
SB300 (Similar To) 2014-01-10 - Incorporated by Rehabilitation and Social Services
SB300 (Similar To) 2014-01-10 - Incorporated by Rehabilitation and Social Services