VA SB339 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Deferred disposition in criminal cases. Allows a court to defer and dismiss a criminal case where the defendant has been diagnosed with autism or an intellectual disability.
Title
Criminal cases; deferred disposition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18100744D-E |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB339E |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100744D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 69.48:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 303.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 303.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 335 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 336 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |