VA SB346 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0112)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0112)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Institutions of higher education; crisis and emergency management plans. Increases the Department of Emergency Management's oversight of institutional crisis and emergency management plans by requiring institutions to certify in writing to the Department that the required annual reviews and functional exercises have been conducted.
Title
Higher educational institutions; crisis and emergency management plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0112) | |
2012-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 112 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB346ER) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-17 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-15 | House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101839D |
Same As/Similar To
HB305 (Same As) 2012-02-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)