VA SB346 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing various allowances and other amounts related to wills, trusts, and fiduciaries. Increases the amounts of various allowances, threshold amounts, and other dollar-based provisions in Title 64.2 (Wills, Trusts, and Fiduciaries) to account for the effect of inflation. The bill also provides that a commissioner of accounts has the same authority to determine the amounts, recipients, and proportions of any gifts made from the estate of an incapacitated person for whom a conservator has been appointed, provided that the total gifts authorized shall not exceed $25,000 in a calendar year and the commissioner shall report to the circuit court his determination as to such gifts.
Title
Wills, trusts, and fiduciaries; increasing various allowances and other threshold amounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532) | |
2014-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 532 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB346ER) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101705D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 2 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 1311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 1313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 1411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 1802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 1905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 1906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2023 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2026 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 424 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 528 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 537 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 609 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |