VA SB360 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0101)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0101)
Summary
Virginia Business Trust Act. Reorganizes provisions of the Virginia Business Trust Act regarding the winding up, cancellation, and reinstatement of business trusts. The revisions to the structure of the Act conform to the organization of the Virginia Stock and Nonstock Corporation Acts. Other provisions address the involuntary cancellation and reinstatement of foreign business trusts and the cancellation of a business trust's existence. The measure also authorizes the removal of the initial registered office and registered agent information in the articles of trust if a statement of change is on file with the Commission, and makes technical clarifications.
Title
Business Trust Act; reorganizes provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0101) | |
2008-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 101 (effective 4/1/09) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-20 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB360ER) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-19 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Passed House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-18 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-14 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080090864 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB360 |