VA SB374 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Board for Waterworks and Wastewater Works Operators and Onsite Sewage System Professionals; installer of alternative onsite sewage systems. Provides a waiver from a written examination for applicants for licensure as an installer of alternative onsite sewage systems if the applicant can provide satisfactory proof to the Board of having been actively and continuously providing services as an installer of alternative onsite sewage systems immediately prior to July 1, 2009, for at least two years.
Title
Alternative onsite sewage systems; waiver from examination applicants for licensure as an installer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-03 | House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-03-02 | House: Continued to 2011 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote | |
2010-03-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-02-19 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #4 | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10101109D-E | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB374E | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Amendments by Senator Puckett agreed to | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 2-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101109D |