VA SB374 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cattle Industry Board; assessment from sale of cattle. Renames the Beef Industry Council as the Cattle Industry Board (the Board) and renames the Virginia Beef Industry Fund as the Virginia Cattle Industry Fund (the Fund). The bill simplifies the definition of the term "cattle" and reduces the size of the Board from 15 to 11 members. Beginning in 2019 and ending in 2023, the bill increases the amount of the assessment from the sale of cattle, currently at $0.25 per head, to $0.50 per head, with the assessment to be deposited in the Fund to support Board activities. The bill allows producers who are dissatisfied with the assessment and the Board's use of it to receive a refund and prohibits the Department of Taxation from collecting assessments that were unpaid or uncollected prior to July 1, 2018. Finally, the bill staggers the terms of the initial members appointed to the Board and distinguishes the assessment-supported Fund from the National Beef Checkoff.
Title
Cattle Industry Board; assessment from sale of cattle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 469 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB374ER) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title replaced 18107499D-H1 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute (95-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB374H1 |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18107499D-H1 |
2018-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107499D-H1 |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB374S1 |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18104927D-S1 |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18104927D-S1 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102242D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 1100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 1300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 1302.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 1304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 1306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |