VA SB378 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0821)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0821)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Computer trespass; penalty. Expands the crime of computer trespass to provide that the prohibited actions that constitute computer trespass are criminalized if done through intentionally deceptive means and without authority and specifies that a computer hardware or software provider, an interactive computer service, or a telecommunications or cable operator does not have to provide notice of its activities to a computer user that a reasonable computer user should expect may occur.
Title
Computer trespass; expands the crime.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0821) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 821 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB378ER) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (90-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House (90-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB378S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107397D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107397D-S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Incorporates SB844 (Mason) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102624D |
Same As/Similar To
SB844 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Incorporated by Judiciary