VA SB384 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0350)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0350)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Attorney-client privilege; work product protection; limitations on waivers. Provides that when the disclosure of a communication or information covered by attorney-client privilege or work product protection made in a proceeding or to any public body operates as a waiver of the privilege or protection, such waiver only extends to undisclosed communications or information if (i) the waiver was intentional, and (ii) the disclosed and undisclosed communications or information concern the same subject matter and ought in fairness be considered together. Inadvertent disclosures do not operate as a waiver if reasonable steps were taken to prevent disclosure and to rectify the error. The bill also provides that an agreement between parties as to the effect of a disclosure is only binding upon the parties to the agreement unless it has been incorporated into a court order. The bill does not limit any otherwise applicable waiver of attorney-client privilege or work product protection by an inmate who files an action challenging his conviction or sentence. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference.
Title
Attorney-client privilege and work product protection; limitations on waivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0350) | |
2010-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 350 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-12 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB384ER) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2010-03-03 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (19-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100501D |