VA SB384 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Sex offenses prohibiting proximity to children; public libraries; penalty. Provides that any adult who is convicted of an offense prohibiting proximity to children, when the offense occurred on or after July 1, 2014, shall as part of his sentence be forever prohibited from knowingly and intentionally having any contact whatsoever with children that are not in his custody on the premises of any place that he knows or has reason to know is a public library. A violation is a Class 6 felony.
Title
Sexual offenders; certain persons prohibited proximity to children at public libraries, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2015 in Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Continued to 2015 in Finance (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104494D-S1 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103188D |