VA SB398 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007)
Summary
Virginia Security of Public Deposits Act; qualified public depository; eligible collateral. Includes as eligible collateral Federal Home Loan Bank letters-of-credit that adhere to the guidelines as promulgated by the Treasury Board. The bill also amends the definition of "qualified public depository" to include banks, trust companies, or savings institutions that are organized under the laws of another state and having a main office or branch office in Virginia where deposits are accepted, checks are paid, and money is lent.
Title
Security of Public Deposits Act; eligible collateral & amends definition of public depository.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007) | |
2008-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 7 (effective 2/19/08) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-12 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB398ER) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-30 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB398S1 | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080143300-S1 | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080143300-S1 | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Rereferred to Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/07 084544300 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB398 |