VA SB423 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices; sexual orientation and gender identity. Adds discrimination on the basis of an individual's sexual orientation or gender identity as an unlawful housing practice. The bill defines sexual orientation and gender identity.
Title
Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in General Laws |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100962D |