VA SB424 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Line of Duty Act; fire company personnel of the Virginia National Guard. Includes under the coverage of the Line of Duty Act individuals employed as fire company personnel for the Virginia National Guard.
Title
Line of Duty Act; under coverage individuals employed as fire company personnel for National Guard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 573 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB424ER) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-29 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB424S1 | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104363D-S1 | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Incorporates SB10 | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Incorporates SB99 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104363D-S1 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101796D |
Same As/Similar To
SB10 (Similar To) 2012-01-18 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
SB99 (Similar To) 2012-01-18 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
HB42 (Same As) 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374)
SB99 (Similar To) 2012-01-18 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
HB42 (Same As) 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374)