VA SB427 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0354)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0354)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Disclosure of insurance policy limits; wrongful death action. Allows the personal representative of the estate of a decedent who died as a result of a motor vehicle accident, or his attorney, to request the disclosure of the liability limits of an insurance policy prior to filing a civil action for wrongful death resulting from a motor vehicle accident. The party requesting this information shall provide the insurer with (i) the date of the accident, (ii) the name and last known address of the alleged tortfeasor, (iii) a copy of the accident report, if any, (iv) the claim number, if available, and (v) the decedent's death certificate; the certificate of qualification of the personal representative of the decedent's estate; the names and relationship of the statutory beneficiaries of the decedent; medical bills, if any; and a description of the source, amount, and payment history of the claimed income loss for each beneficiary. The bill also provides that disclosure of a policy's limits shall not constitute an admission that the alleged injury is subject to the policy. This bill incorporates
Title
Insurance policy limits; allows personal representative of estate of decedent to request disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0354) | |
2010-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 354 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-12 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB427ER) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Title replaced 10105577D-H1 | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB427H1 | |
2010-03-03 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105577D-H1 | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105577D-H1 | |
2010-02-26 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB427S1 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104622D-S1 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104622D-S1 | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103749D |
Same As/Similar To
SB638 (Similar To) 2010-02-08 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB427-Herring) (14-Y 0-N)