VA SB442 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (10-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (10-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Design and inspection of onsite sewage systems. Establishes minimum required inspection frequencies for alternative onsite systems.
Title
Onsite sewage systems; design and inspection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (10-Y 12-N) (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-21 | House: Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (10-Y 12-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB442S1 | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105017D-S1 | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105017D-S1 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 4-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102741D |