VA SB442 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Breeding of dogs and cats for research; reporting. Requires any person who or entity that breeds dogs and cats for animal testing facilities to report certain information to the State Veterinarian on a monthly basis. The report shall include information regarding the birth, acquisition, death, sale, transfer, or other disposition of a dog or cat in the prior month. Breeding of dogs and cats for research; reporting. Requires any person who or entity that breeds dogs and cats for animal testing facilities to report certain information to the State Veterinarian on a monthly basis. The report shall include information regarding the birth, acquisition, death, sale, transfer, or other disposition of a dog or cat in the prior month.
Title
Dogs and cats; breeding for research, reporting to State Veterinarian.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104122D |