VA SB465 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
Summary
VPA police. Allows a Virginia Port Authority (VPA) police officer to provide enhanced supply chain security beyond the locality where VPA property is located. This bill is identical to
Title
Port Authority; police officer to provide security beyond locality where property is located.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529) | |
2008-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 529 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB465ER) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-28 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Passed House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-27 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-26 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-26 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-25 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-22 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081165828 |
Same As/Similar To
HB1206 (Same As) 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0324)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB465 |