VA SB465 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - House: Continued to 2013 in Appropriations by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - House: Continued to 2013 in Appropriations by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Appointment, compensation, and offices of general registrars. Provides that all general registrars shall serve on a full-time basis. The bill takes effect on enactment of an appropriation to effectuate its purposes.
Title
General registrars; shall serve on a full-time basis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | House: Continued to 2013 in Appropriations by voice vote | |
2012-03-02 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-02 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 4-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 3-N) | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103290D |
Same As/Similar To
HB850 (Same As) 2012-02-10 - House: Continued to 2013 in Appropriations by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |