VA SB466 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0404)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0404)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Guardianship; communication between incapacitated person and others. Provides that a guardian shall not unreasonably restrict an incapacitated person's ability to communicate with, visit, or interact with other persons with whom the incapacitated person has an established relationship.
Title
Guardianship; communication between incapacitated person and others.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0404) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0404) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 404 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB466ER) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Title replaced 16105591D-H1 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB466H1 |
2016-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105591D-H1 |
2016-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105591D-H1 |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16104562D-ES1 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB466ES1 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Wagner agreed to |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16104562D-S1 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SB632 |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16104562D-S1 |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100028D |
Same As/Similar To
SB632 (Similar To) 2016-01-29 - Incorporated by Rehabilitation and Social Services
HB342 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0405)
HB342 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0405)