VA SB473 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fort Monroe Authority Act; declaration of policy. Removes the requirement for the consent of both the Governor and the General Assembly in cases where real property interests in the Area of Operation at Fort Monroe are sold. The bill retains, however, the requirement that such sale may only be accomplished under covenants, historic conservation easements, or other appropriate legal restrictions approved as to form by the Attorney General that protect these historic and natural resources, and adds historic preservation easements to these conditions. The bill provides that insofar as the provisions of the Fort Monroe Authority Act are inconsistent with the provisions of any other law, general, special or local, or parts thereof, the provisions of the Act shall be controlling. The bill provides that properties in the Wherry Quarter and Inner Fort areas identified in the Fort Monroe Reuse Plan may only be sold with the consent of both the Governor and the General Assembly, except that any transfer to the National Park Service shall require only the approval of the Governor. The bill adds definitions of the terms "Fort Monroe Master Plan" and "State Memorandum of Understanding" and gives the Authority the power to exercise the Commonwealth's powers regarding the State Memorandum of Understanding. The bill also provides that the Authority is solely responsible for regulating the operation of golf carts and utility vehicles within the Area of Operation by Authority staff and contractors engaged by the Authority, while such staff and contractors are conducting the official business of the Authority. By its terms, the bill will not become effective until the completion of the Fort Monroe Master Plan, and it instructs the Authority's Executive Director to advise the Governor and others when the Master Plan is completed.
Title
Fort Monroe Authority Act; declaration of policy, Governor to approve Fort Monroe Master Plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482) | |
2012-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 482 (effective - see bill) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-28 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB473ER) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-21 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB473S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105265D-S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105265D-S1 | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102338D |
Same As/Similar To
HB580 (Same As) 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2337 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2339 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2341.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2349.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |