VA SB473 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB473
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; School Construction Fund and Program; Gaming Proceeds Fund revenues. Establishes the School Construction Fund as a special nonreverting fund in the state treasury and requires the Department of Education to establish the School Construction Program for the purpose of providing grants from the Fund, subject to certain conditions, to school boards that leverage federal, state, and local programs and resources to finance the design and construction of new school buildings and facilities or the modernization and maintenance of existing school buildings and facilities. The bill provides that three percent of any fiscal year's budget surplus shall be appropriated to the School Construction Fund and Program. The bill also provides that any remaining revenues not appropriated by the Gaming Proceeds Fund shall be appropriated to the School Construction Fund and Program. Under current law, any remaining revenues in the Gaming Proceeds Fund not appropriated remain in the Fund until appropriated by the General Assembly for programs established to address public school construction, renovations, or upgrades.
Title
School Construction Fund and Program; created and established, Gaming Proceeds Fund revenues.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Todd Pillion [R] | Sen. Stephen Newman [R] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] |
Sen. Jeremy McPike [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | Senate | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-09 | House | Delegates: O'Quinn, Austin, Torian |
2022-03-09 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senators: McClellan, Saslaw, Stanley |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | House requested conference committee |
2022-03-03 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2022-03-02 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB473H1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106986D-H1 |
2022-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106986D-H1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB473S1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106368D-S1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Incorporates SB117 (Newman) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106368D-S1 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100790D |
Same As/Similar To
SB473 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1509.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 140.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4125 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |