VA SB473 | 2022 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB473
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School division maintenance reserve tool; School Construction Fund and Program established. Requires the Department of Education, in consultation with the Department of General Services, to develop or adopt and maintain a data collection tool to assist each school board to determine the relative age of each public school building in the local school division and the amount of maintenance reserve funds that are necessary to restore each such building. The bill requires each school board to provide to the Department of Education in a timely fashion the local data that is necessary to ensure that such tool remains relevant and useful for the determination of maintenance reserve needs. The bill requires the Department of Education to consider converting or using as a template the Department of General Services' Real Estate and Assets Management system for tracking buildings and infrastructure maintenance status to meet the requirement to maintain such tool. The bill also establishes the School Construction Fund and Program for the purpose of awarding grants to local school boards to fund the construction of new public school buildings or the renovation or expansion of existing public school buildings in the local school division. The bill requires any revenues remaining in the Gaming Proceeds Fund after certain enumerated appropriations are made to be appropriated to the School Construction Fund.
Title
School Construction Fund and Program; created and established.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Todd Pillion [R] | Sen. Stephen Newman [R] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] |
Sen. Jeremy McPike [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009) | |
2022-08-04 | Governor: of adjournment of the 2022 Special Session l) | |
2022-08-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 9 (effective on the 1st day of the 4th month following the month | |
2022-07-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., August 4, 2022 | |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on July 28, 2022 |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-07-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB473ER) |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-06-01 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) |
2022-06-01 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0--N) |
2022-06-01 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-09 | House | Delegates: O'Quinn, Austin, Torian |
2022-03-09 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senators: McClellan, Saslaw, Stanley |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | House requested conference committee |
2022-03-03 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2022-03-02 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB473H1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106986D-H1 |
2022-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106986D-H1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB473S1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106368D-S1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Incorporates SB117 (Newman) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106368D-S1 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100790D |
Same As/Similar To
SB473 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
HB563 (Same As) 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
HB563 (Same As) 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
HB563 (Same As) 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
HB563 (Same As) 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1509.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 140.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4125 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |