VA SB477 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Historical African American cemeteries. Changes the date of establishment that qualifies historical African American cemeteries for appropriated funds to care for such cemeteries from prior to January 1, 1900, to prior to January 1, 1948, and provides that the total number of graves in a qualifying cemetery shall be the number of markers of African Americans who were interred in such cemetery prior to January 1, 1948. Under current law, the total number of graves is the number of markers of African Americans who lived at any time between January 1, 1800, and January 1, 1900.
Title
Historical African American cemeteries; changes date of establishment for qualification of funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187) | |
2022-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 187 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB477ER) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB477E |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22101065D-E |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101065D |
Same As/Similar To
HB140 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450)
HB140 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450)
HB140 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450)
Subjects
African Americans
Conservation
Historic Areas Landmarks and Monuments
Religious and Charitable Matters; Cemeteries
Conservation
Historic Areas Landmarks and Monuments
Religious and Charitable Matters; Cemeteries