VA SB485 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certain property deemed exempt from taxation. Deems certain property owned by the Norfolk Chapter of the Izaak Walton League of America to have been exempt from taxation pursuant to the 1902 Constitution of Virginia. The current Constitution provides that property exempt from taxation on the effective date of the constitutional revisions shall continue to be exempt until otherwise provided by the General Assembly. The bill provides that such exemption shall not be construed to provide the Norfolk Chapter of the Izaak Walton League of America a claim for a refund for any property taxes paid on such property prior to January 1, 2017.
Title
Izaak Walton League of America, Norfolk Chapter of; exempt from taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 23-N) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 623 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB485ER) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 23-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House (76-Y 23-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 9-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101853D |