VA SB485 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Delinquency Prevention and Youth Development Act; youth services citizen boards; duties; guidelines. Directs the Board of Juvenile Justice to establish and make available to localities a list of best practice program models that are likely to qualify for grants under the Delinquency Prevention and Youth Development Act. The bill requires youth services citizen boards to include representatives of law enforcement and the faith and business communities and allows local governing bodies to appoint as members of the youth services citizen board members of the community policy and management team or a similar entity, subject to certain requirements set forth in the bill. The bill allows youth services citizen boards to establish youth advisory teams for the purposes of consultation and advice regarding youth services programs. The bill removes the requirement that local youth services programs maintain and disseminate an annual inventory of youth-related and parenting-related services and programs available in the locality. Delinquency Prevention and Youth Development Act; youth services citizen boards; duties; guidelines. Directs the Board of Juvenile Justice to establish and make available to localities a list of best practice program models that are likely to qualify for grants under the Delinquency Prevention and Youth Development Act. The bill requires youth services citizen boards to include representatives of law enforcement and the faith and business communities and allows local governing bodies to appoint as members of the youth services citizen board members of the community policy and management team or a similar entity, subject to certain requirements set forth in the bill. The bill allows youth services citizen boards to establish youth advisory teams for the purposes of consultation and advice regarding youth services programs. The bill removes the requirement that local youth services programs maintain and disseminate an annual inventory of youth-related and parenting-related services and programs available in the locality.
Title
Delinquency Prevention and Youth Development Act; youth services citizen boards, duties, guidelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 522 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB485ER) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-01 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103955D |