VA SB49 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Management of the menhaden fishery. Extends the sunset date for management of the menhaden fishery from January 1, 2015, to July 1, 2016. The bill also allows any person purchasing more than one of the licenses for the same vessel to catch menhaden with a purse net to pay a fee equal to that for a single license. The provisions of the program enacted in 2014 that would be extended include (i) criteria for qualifying for a limited entry purse seine bait license, (ii) allocation of the total allowable landings, (iii) administration of the management program, (iv) reporting requirements, (v) biological sampling, (vi) license fees, (vii) authority of the Commissioner of the Marine Resources Commission, and (viii) annual closure of the fishery.
Title
Menhaden fishery; extends sunset provision for management of fishery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104) | |
2014-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 104 (effective -see bill) | |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB49ER) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-14 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed House (93-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-12 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB49S1 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104385D-S1 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104385D-S1 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 1-N) |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101478D |
Same As/Similar To
HB655 (Same As) 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0133)