VA SB515 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; possession or transportation; hospital that provides mental health services or developmental services; penalty. Makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person to knowingly possess in or transport into the building of any hospital that provides mental health services or developmental services in the Commonwealth, including an emergency department or other facility rendering emergency medical care, any (i) firearm or other weapon designed or intended to propel a missile or projectile of any kind; (ii) knife, except a pocket knife having a folding metal blade of less than three inches; or (iii) other dangerous weapon, including explosives and stun weapons. The bill also provides that notice of such prohibitions shall be posted conspicuously at the public entrance of any hospital and no person shall be convicted of the offense if such notice is not posted, unless such person had actual notice of the prohibitions. The bill provides that any such firearm, knife, explosive, or weapon shall be subject to seizure by a law-enforcement officer and forfeited to the Commonwealth and specifies exceptions to the prohibition.
Title
Weapons; carrying into hospital that provides mental health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 17, 2024 | |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Communicated to Governor |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Governor's substitute printed 24109218D-S2 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB515ER) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House (52-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB515S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106820D-S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106820D-S1 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101827D |
Same As/Similar To
HB23 (Similar To) 2024-02-02 - Incorporated by Public Safety
HB861 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
HB861 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor