VA SB518 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Funding among highway systems. Includes primary state highway system extensions, the part of the primary highway that runs through a city or town, in the list of highways that receive the 25 percent for reconstruction of deteriorated highways of the amount allocated each year by the Commonwealth Transportation Board. The bill also reduces the number of vehicles per day on unpaved roads from 200 to 50 for the unpaved roads that may be considered for five percent of the annual allocation.
Title
Highway systems; funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 741 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB518ER) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2014-02-27 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103392D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1048 (Same As) 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087)