VA SB523 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - House: Stricken from docket by Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - House: Stricken from docket by Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Disaster Response Fund; hazardous materials in dwellings. Authorizes funds from the Virginia Disaster Response Fund to be disbursed to political subdivisions to political subdivisions, for costs incurred for the removal of Chinese drywall hazardous materials, from, and subsequent repair of, dwelling units. Under the bill, in order to qualify for disbursements from the fund, the existence of the hazard in the dwelling unit must be certified by the political subdivision and the application for the funds must be made by the political subdivision on behalf of the owner of the dwelling unit constructed in the calendar years 2006 and 2007.
Title
Disaster Response Fund; funds to be disbursed for removal of Chinese drywall hazardous materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | House: Stricken from docket by Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote | |
2010-02-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3 | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10102256D-E | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB523E | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Norment agreed to | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102256D |