VA SB523 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Voter identification; electronic pollbooks to contain photographs of voters. Requires electronic pollbooks to contain the photographs of registered voters that are obtained by the general registrars in the production of voter photo identification cards or contained in a voter's Department of Motor Vehicles record. The bill also provides that if the electronic pollbook contains the voter's photograph, the officer of election is required to access that photograph and the voter is not required to present one of the statutorily required forms of identification. The bill prohibits lists of voters furnished pursuant to current law from containing any voter's photograph. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2019.
Title
Voter identification; electronic pollbooks to contain photographs of voters, effective clause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (12-Y 9-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18103159D-E |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB523E |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (8-Y 5-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103159D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 444 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 611 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 643 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 208.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |