VA SB525 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-24 - Stricken at request of Patron in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-24 - Stricken at request of Patron in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Stillbirth Support Grant Program. Establishes the Stillbirth Support Grant Program for the purpose of providing grants to individuals who delivered a stillborn child, as defined by the bill, to assist with out-of-pocket costs associated with such delivery. Under the bill, an application for such a grant must be submitted within the same calendar year as such delivery of a stillborn child occurs.
Title
Stillbirth Support Grant Program; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Stricken at request of Patron in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Health |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24105044D |
Same As/Similar To
HB584 (Similar To) 2024-01-23 - Stricken from docket by Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N)