VA SB528 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0261)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0261)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prisons; Treatment and control of prisoners. Requires a licensed psychiatrist or licensed clinical psychologist who is experienced in the diagnosis, treatment, and risk assessment of sex offenders to oversee sex offender treatment programs in the Virginia Department of Corrections. The program shall be administered by a licensed psychiatrist, licensed clinical psychologist, or a licensed mental health professional who is a certified sex offender treatment provider.
Title
Prisoners; licensed psychiatrist or clinical psychologist to oversee sex offender treatment program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0261) | |
2010-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 261 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB528ER) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-22 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #2 | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB528S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105058D-S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105058D-S1 | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101801D |