VA SB539 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533)
Summary
Higher Education; threat assessment teams at each public institution of higher education. Requires the board of visitors or other governing body of every public institution of higher education in the Commonwealth to establish a threat assessment team. The bill also requires the team to adopt a campus-wide committee charged with education and prevention of violence on campus.
Title
Higher educational institutions; board of visitors, etc. to establish violence prevention committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533) | |
2008-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 533 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB539ER) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-27 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Passed House (94-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Motion to reconsider rerefer agreed to | |
2008-02-27 | House: Rereferred to Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2008-02-27 | House: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to | |
2008-02-27 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-26 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-25 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-22 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB539S1 | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 083363804-S1 | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 083363804-S1 | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Higher Education | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 089833288 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB539 |