VA SB55 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amending death certificates. Requires the State Registrar, upon receipt of an affidavit and supporting evidence testifying to corrected information on a death certificate within 45 days of the filing of a death certificate, to amend such death certificate to reflect the new information and evidence. The bill also requires the State Registrar, upon receipt of an affidavit and supporting evidence testifying to corrected demographic information on a death certificate more than 45 days after the filing of a death certificate, to amend such death certificate to reflect the new information and evidence.
Title
Death certificates; State Registrar to amend certificates after receiving corrected information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117) | |
2022-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 117 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB55ER) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB55S1 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22104367D-S1 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22104367D-S1 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2021-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101910D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1001 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0116)
HB1001 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0116)
HB1001 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0116)