VA SB550 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Front Royal. Makes extensive updates to the Town of Front Royal's charter by deleting outdated provisions and updating references to current law. Other changes include granting certain powers regarding blighted or derelict structures, rewriting public notice provisions, and granting authority to contract with users from outside the town for provision of water, gas, electric, sewer, or other utility services, notwithstanding any other provision of law. This bill is identical to HB 1166.
Title
Front Royal, Town of; amending charter, extensive updates to outdated provisions and references.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 329 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB550ER) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-02-21 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104682D |