VA SB551 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Scenic river designation. Designates a 10.7-mile segment of the Cranesnest River in Dickenson County as a component of the Virginia Scenic Rivers System. The bill also removes from several sections a provision regarding the suitability of certain lands for mining under the Scenic Rivers Act and places them under one section that would then apply to all scenic rivers.
Title
Cranesnest River; designates as component of Virginia Scenic Rivers System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (20-Y 74-N) (Y: 20 N: 76 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (26-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 18-N 1-A) (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (26-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 18-N 1-A) (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823) | |
2014-05-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (20-Y 74-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (20-Y 74-N) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (26-Y 12-N) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 7-N) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Governor's substitute printed 14105790D-S1 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB551ER) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title replaced 14105008D-H1 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (26-Y 13-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 18-N 1-A) |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute (79-Y 18-N 1-A) |
2014-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB551H1 |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14105008D-H1 |
2014-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 14105008D-H1 |
2014-02-19 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14103527D |