VA SB556 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0480)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0480)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Opiate addiction treatment; nonmethadone opioid replacements. Removes certain restrictions on licensure of providers who provide treatment for persons with opiate addiction using opioid replacements that have been approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration for the treatment of opioid addiction. Such restrictions include the proximity of the provider to a school and community notice requirements.
Title
Opiate addiction treatment; nonmethadone opioid replacements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0480) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 480 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB556ER) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Title replaced 16105656D-H1 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB556H1 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105656D-H1 |
2016-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105656D-H1 |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101464D |