VA SB557 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (voter referendum); marriage; repeal of same-sex marriage prohibition; affirmative right to marry. Provides for a referendum at the November 8, 2022, election to approve or reject an amendment that would repeal the constitutional provision defining marriage as only a union between a man and woman as well as the related provisions that are no longer valid as a result of the United States Supreme Court decision in Obergefell v. Hodges, 576 U.S. 644 (2015). The amendment provides that the right to marry is a fundamental right inherent in the liberty of persons and requires the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions and agents to issue marriage licenses, recognize marriages, and treat all marriages equally under the law, regardless of the sex or gender of the parties to the marriage. Religious organizations and clergy acting in their religious capacity have the right to refuse to perform any marriage.
Title
Constitutional amendment; repeal of same-sex marriage prohibition (submitting to qualified voters).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 5-N) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100392D |