VA SB572 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Improper driving; jury. Provides that a jury hearing a case involving a person charged with reckless driving where the accused's degree of culpability is slight may find the accused not guilty of reckless driving but guilty of improper driving, which is punishable as a traffic infraction. Currently, only the court hearing the case may find the accused guilty of improper driving.
Title
Improper driving; jury may find accused not guilty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred from Transportation by voice vote |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102005D |