VA SB616 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Housing and Community Development; rental assistance pilot project. Requires the Department of Housing and Community Development to establish a three-year rental assistance pilot project and to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the Housing Commission. The provisions of the bill are conditional upon an appropriation of general funds.
Title
Rental assistance pilot project; Department of Housing and Community Development to establish.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10103945D-E | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB616E | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-01-15 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10103945D |