VA SB617 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Summary
Apprentice hunting license. Authorizes the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries to issue an apprentice hunting license. This license would be issued in lieu of the current state resident or nonresident basic hunting license. It is a one-time license that expires two years from the date of purchase and does not require the licensee to complete a hunter education course. The fee for obtaining the license would be $10 for residents and $20 for nonresidents. The purpose of the bill is to extend limited hunting privileges to persons interested in learning about hunting sports. This bill is identical to
Title
Apprentice hunting license; Department of Game and Inland Fisheries to issue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416) | |
2008-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 416 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB617ER) | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2008-02-22 | House: Amendment by Delegate Lingamfelter agreed to | |
2008-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-20 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 083927328-E | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB617E | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083927328 |
Same As/Similar To
HB1175 (Same As) 2008-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB617 |