VA SB622 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recovery residences. Requires that all recovery residences be certified by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services (the Department) and that recovery residences, as a condition of such certification, comply with any minimum square footage requirements related to beds and sleeping rooms established by the credentialing entity, which shall be no less than the square footage requirements set forth in the Uniform Statewide Building Code. The bill requires every person who operates a recovery residence to disclose to potential residents its credentialing entity. If the credentialing entity is the National Alliance for Recovery Residences, the bill requires the recovery residence to disclose the level of support provided by the recovery residence and, if the credentialing entity is Oxford House, Inc., the bill requires the recovery residence to disclose that the recovery residence is self-governed and unstaffed. The bill also requires the Department to include such information on the list of all recovery residences maintained by the Department on its website. The bill exempts recovery residences from the provisions of the Virginia Landlord and Tenant Act.
Title
Recovery residences; disclosure to potential residents that residence is certified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732) | |
2022-04-27 | House | Enacted, Chapter 732 (effective 7/1/22) |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB622ER2) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 2-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 2-N) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB622ER) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Title replaced 22107376D-H2 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House with substitute (97-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB622H2 |
2022-03-02 | House | Substitute by Delegate Coyner agreed to 22107376D-H2 |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns substitute rejected 22107085D-H1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | House | Floor substitute printed 22107376D-H2 (Coyner) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107085D-H1 |
2022-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB622S1 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105949D-S1 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105949D-S1 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104207D |
Same As/Similar To
HB277 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0755)
HB277 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0755)
HB277 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0755)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2291 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 431.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |