VA SB63 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034)
Summary
Board of Nursing; membership. Requires that at least one of the seven registered nurses on the Board of Nursing be a licensed nurse practitioner.
Title
Nursing, Board of; membership.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034) | |
2008-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 34 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-19 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB63ER) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-18 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | House: Passed House Block Vote (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-14 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-15 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-15 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 084528248-E | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB63E | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-10 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2007-12-21 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2007-12-21 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084528248 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB63 |