VA SB632 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cash proffers; acceptance by localities. Delays collection or acceptance of a cash proffer by a locality until the completion of the final inspection of the subject property and prior to the time of the issuance of any certificate of occupancy.
Title
Cash proffers; delays collection or acceptance by locality until completion of final inspection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (77-Y 22-N) (Y: 79 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (77-Y 22-N) (Y: 79 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 613 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB632ER) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (77-Y 22-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Passed House with amendment (77-Y 22-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2010-02-23 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-23 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-22 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-19 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (16-Y 5-N) | |
2010-02-18 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10104133D |