VA SB635 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; sale and delivery of mixed beverages and pre-mixed wine for off-premises consumption; third-party delivery license; sunset; repeal. Repeals the July 1, 2024, sunset on provisions that allow (i) distillers that have been appointed as agents of the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority, mixed beverage restaurant licensees, and limited mixed beverage restaurant licensees to sell mixed beverages for off-premises consumption and (ii) farm winery licensees to sell pre-mixed wine for off-premises consumption. The bill also repeals, effective July 1, 2026, third-party delivery licenses. The bill requires the Authority to convene a work group to review third-party delivery licenses and report its findings and recommendations to the Chairmen of the House Committee on General Laws and the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services by November 15, 2024.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; sale and delivery of mixed beverages & pre-mixed wine off-premises.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Rouse [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159) | |
2024-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 159 (effective - see bill) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB635ER) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (82-Y 16-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed House (82-Y 16-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24104534D |
Same As/Similar To
HB688 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Control
Mixed Beverages Alcoholic
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Wine
Mixed Beverages Alcoholic
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Wine
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 206.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 212.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 212.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 231.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |