VA SB637 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0043)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0043)
Summary
Required reporting of child abuse; animal control officers. Adds animal control officers to the list of persons with the duty to report suspected child abuse. Animal control officers already receive training in the recognition of child abuse and neglect and information on how complaints are filed.
Title
Child abuse; animal control officers required to report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0043) | |
2008-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 43 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-19 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB637ER) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-18 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | House: Passed House Block Vote (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-14 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083923336 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB637 |